DC PR23-0377 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-10 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Food Policy Council Beverley Wheeler Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food Policy Council Beverley Wheeler Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-10CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2019-09-27CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-06-21CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0377 Published in the DC Register
2019-06-18CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2019-06-14CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback