DC PR23-0313 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Resolution R23-0100, Effective from May 14, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6343
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Primary Date Alteration Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Primary Date Alteration Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24CouncilResolution R23-0100, Effective from May 14, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6343
2019-05-14CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0100
2019-05-14CouncilFinal Reading
2019-05-14CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-05-09CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback