DC PR23-0286 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Resolution R23-0121, Effective from Jun 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7071
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Resolution R23-0121, Effective from Jun 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7071
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Directors of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Principal Member Corbett Price Reappointment Resolution of 2019
Title
Board of Directors of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Principal Member Corbett Price Reappointment Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Council | Resolution R23-0121, Effective from Jun 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7071 |
2019-06-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0121 |
2019-06-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-05-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-05-30 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0286 |
2019-05-21 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-05-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0286 Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-05-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |