DC PR23-0283 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Resolution R23-0086, Effective from May 07, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Resolution R23-0086, Effective from May 07, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. NFPHC-2018-435-A Modification 2 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and GW Medical Faculty Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Contract No. NFPHC-2018-435-A Modification 2 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and GW Medical Faculty Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Council | Resolution R23-0086, Effective from May 07, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6790 |
2019-05-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0086 |
2019-05-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-05-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-04-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |