DC PR23-0249 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-17 - Final Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Contract Appeals Board Nicholas Majett Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contract Appeals Board Nicholas Majett Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-17CouncilFinal Reading CC
2019-07-10CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-07-09CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR23-0249
2019-06-13CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2019-05-31CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-05-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Facilities and Procurement
2019-05-03CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0249 Published in the DC Register
2019-04-22CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback