DC PR23-0243 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-14 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-14 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Green Finance Authority Board Todd Monash Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Green Finance Authority Board Todd Monash Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Council | Withdrawn |
2019-05-20 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-05-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-05-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-03 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0243 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0243 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42385/Introduction/PR23-0243-Introduction.pdf |