DC PR23-0240 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Resolution R23-0092, Effective from May 07, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Resolution R23-0092, Effective from May 07, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Florida Avenue Multimodal Project Completion Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Florida Avenue Multimodal Project Completion Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Council | Resolution R23-0092, Effective from May 07, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6116 |
2019-05-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0092 |
2019-05-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-05-07 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) |
2019-04-23 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-04-23 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |