DC PR23-0235 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Resolution R23-0116, Effective from Jun 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7066
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Resolution R23-0116, Effective from Jun 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7066
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Secretary of the District of Columbia Kimberly Bassett Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Secretary of the District of Columbia Kimberly Bassett Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Council | Resolution R23-0116, Effective from Jun 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7066 |
2019-06-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0116 |
2019-06-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-05-22 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-05-22 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0235 |
2019-05-09 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-05-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0235 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-04-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |