DC PR23-0226 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Compensation Collective Bargaining Agreement between the District of Columbia Department of Health, Department of Youth Rehabilitation Services, Department on Disability Services, Department of Health Care Finance, Child and Family Services Agency, the Department of Corrections and Fire and Emergency Medical Services Department (Compensation Unit 13) and the District of Columbia Nurses Association Approval Resolution of 2019
Title
Compensation Collective Bargaining Agreement between the District of Columbia Department of Health, Department of Youth Rehabilitation Services, Department on Disability Services, Department of Health Care Finance, Child and Family Services Agency, the Department of Corrections and Fire and Emergency Medical Services Department (Compensation Unit 13) and the District of Columbia Nurses Association Approval Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-04-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0226 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2019-03-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0226 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42202/Introduction/PR23-0226-Introduction.pdf |