DC PR23-0202 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Citizen Review Panel Emily M. Bloomfield Appointment Resolution of 2019
Title
Citizen Review Panel Emily M. Bloomfield Appointment Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-05-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0202 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0202 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42137/Introduction/PR23-0202-Introduction.pdf |