DC PR23-0193 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-12 - Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
Pending: Council Committee of the Whole Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-12 - Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
Pending: Council Committee of the Whole Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Master Facilities Plan Approval Resolution of 2019
Title
Master Facilities Plan Approval Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-07-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-06-05 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-04-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0193 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-03-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0193 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42087/Introduction/PR23-0193-Introduction.pdf |