DC PR23-0147 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Green Finance Authority Board Hannah Hawkins Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Green Finance Authority Board Hannah Hawkins Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2019-05-03CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-03-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0147 Published in the DC Register
2019-03-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2019-02-28CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback