DC PR23-0125 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Resolution R23-0101 Effective from May 28, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6792
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Full-service Grocery Store Resolution Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Full-service Grocery Store Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07CouncilResolution R23-0101 Effective from May 28, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6792
2019-05-28CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0101
2019-05-28CouncilFinal Reading CC
2019-05-01CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-05-01CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR23-0125
2019-04-24CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2019-04-12CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-03-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2019-03-01CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0125 Published in the DC Register
2019-02-19CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback