DC PR23-0120 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Board of Ethics and Government Accountability Charles Nottingham Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
District of Columbia Board of Ethics and Government Accountability Charles Nottingham Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-05-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0120 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-02-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0120 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41882/Introduction/PR23-0120-Introduction.pdf |