DC PR23-0084 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Master Facilities Plan Approval Resolution of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Master Facilities Plan Approval Resolution of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15CouncilWithdrawn
2019-02-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2019-02-01CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0084 Published in the DC Register
2019-01-24CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback