DC PR23-0081 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Resolution R23-0047, Effective from Mar 15, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2932
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Resolution R23-0047, Effective from Mar 15, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2932
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council Urging the Federal Government to Prevent Nuclear War Resolution of 2019
Title
Sense of the Council Urging the Federal Government to Prevent Nuclear War Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Council | Resolution R23-0047, Effective from Mar 15, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2932 |
2019-03-15 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0047 |
2019-03-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0081 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-22 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-01-22 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |