DC PR23-0060 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Resolution R23-0032, Effective from Mar 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2907
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Resolution R23-0032, Effective from Mar 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2907
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Deemed approved 3/29/2019
PREVIOUSLY
PR 22-1161
Title
Food Policy Director Ona Balkus Confirmation Resolution of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Council | Resolution R23-0032, Effective from Mar 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2907 |
2019-03-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0032 |
2019-03-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-02-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-02-26 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0060 |
2019-02-15 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-02-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0060 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-01-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |