DC PR23-0049 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-29 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-29 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deemed disapproved 2/21/2019
PREVIOUSLY
PR 22-1108
Title
District of Columbia Commission on Human Rights Mark Herzog Confirmation Resolution of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0049 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-01-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0049 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41571/Introduction/PR23-0049-Introduction.pdf |