DC PR22-1133 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Resolution R22-0701 Effective from December 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Resolution R22-0701 Effective from December 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District Of Columbia Housing Authority Board Of Commission Lejuan Strickland Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Title
District Of Columbia Housing Authority Board Of Commission Lejuan Strickland Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-04 | Council | Resolution R22-0701 Effective from December 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 19 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0701 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-12-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-12-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-1133 |
2018-12-06 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-11-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-11-30 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-1133 Published in the DC Register |
2018-11-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2018-11-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |