DC PR22-1122 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - Resolution R22-0655 Effective from November 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13351
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - Resolution R22-0655 Effective from November 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13351
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
University Of The District Of Columbia Exclusive Pouring Rights Agreement With The Bottling Group Llc Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Title
University Of The District Of Columbia Exclusive Pouring Rights Agreement With The Bottling Group Llc Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-13 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Council | Resolution R22-0655 Effective from November 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13351 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0655 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-11-13 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-11-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |