DC PR22-1119 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-23 - Resolution R22-0646 Effective from November 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13006
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-23 - Resolution R22-0646 Effective from November 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13006
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. Nfphc-2018-436-a Modification 1 Between The Not-for-profit Hospital Corporation And Gw Medical Faculty Inc Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Title
Contract No. Nfphc-2018-436-a Modification 1 Between The Not-for-profit Hospital Corporation And Gw Medical Faculty Inc Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-13 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-23 | Council | Resolution R22-0646 Effective from November 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13006 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0646 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-11-13 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-11-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |