DC PR22-1087 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Resolution R22-0702 Effective from December 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Resolution R22-0702 Effective from December 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Housing Production Trust Fund Board Lynn French Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Title
Housing Production Trust Fund Board Lynn French Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-04 | Council | Resolution R22-0702 Effective from December 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 20 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0702 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-12-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-12-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-1087 |
2018-12-06 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-11-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-11-13 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2018-11-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-1087 Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |