DC PR22-1002 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-29 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-29 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Department Of Forensic Sciences Science Advisory Board Rulemaking Approval Resolution Of 2018
Title
Department Of Forensic Sciences Science Advisory Board Rulemaking Approval Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-11-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2018-09-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-1002 Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-1002 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40971/PR22-1002-Introduction.pdf |