DC PR22-0969 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-12 - Resolution R22-0606 Effective from October 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11429
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Board Of Directors Of The Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Jeff Marootian Confirmation Resolution Of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board Of Directors Of The Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Jeff Marootian Confirmation Resolution Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-12CouncilResolution R22-0606 Effective from October 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11429
2018-10-02CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R22-0606
2018-10-02CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-09-26CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-09-26CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR22-0969
2018-09-26CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2018-09-21CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-09-18CouncilReferred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
2018-07-20CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR22-0969 Published in the DC Register
2018-07-11CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback