DC PR22-0952 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Resolution R22-0566 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8000
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Resolution R22-0566 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8000
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. Nfphc-436-a Between The Not-for-profit Hospital Corporation And Gw Medical Faculty Inc Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Title
Contract No. Nfphc-436-a Between The Not-for-profit Hospital Corporation And Gw Medical Faculty Inc Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Council | Resolution R22-0566 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8000 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0566 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-07-10 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-07-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |