DC PR22-0928 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-27 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-27 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Charter School Board Lea Crusey Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Title
Public Charter School Board Lea Crusey Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-08-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-06-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0928 Published in the DC Register |
2018-06-26 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-06-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-0928 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40492/PR22-0928-Introduction.pdf |