DC PR22-0909 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-19 - Resolution R22-0602 Effective from October 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-19 - Resolution R22-0602 Effective from October 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Food Policy Council Alexander Moore Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Title
Food Policy Council Alexander Moore Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-19 | Council | Resolution R22-0602 Effective from October 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11629 |
2018-10-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0602 |
2018-10-02 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-09-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-09-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0909 |
2018-06-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0909 Published in the DC Register |
2018-06-26 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2018-06-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |