DC PR22-0877 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-12 - Resolution R22-0605 Effective from October 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11425
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-12 - Resolution R22-0605 Effective from October 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11425
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2019 Income Tax Secured Revenue Bond, General Obligation Bond And General Obligation And Income Tax Secured Bond Anticipation Note Issuance Authorization Resolution Of 2018
Title
Fiscal Year 2019 Income Tax Secured Revenue Bond, General Obligation Bond And General Obligation And Income Tax Secured Bond Anticipation Note Issuance Authorization Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-12 | Council | Resolution R22-0605 Effective from October 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11425 |
2018-10-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0605 |
2018-10-02 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-09-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-09-26 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0877 |
2018-06-25 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-06-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-06-12 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2018-06-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0877 Published in the DC Register |
2018-06-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |