DC PR22-0870 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Resolution R22-0506 Effective from June 5, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 6449
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Resolution R22-0506 Effective from June 5, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 6449
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Task Orders For Contract No. Dcrl-2015-c-0100 With Deloitte Consulting, Llp Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Title
Task Orders For Contract No. Dcrl-2015-c-0100 With Deloitte Consulting, Llp Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Council | Resolution R22-0506 Effective from June 5, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 6449 |
2018-06-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0506 |
2018-06-05 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-06-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-05-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |