DC PR22-0861 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Resolution R22-0569 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8004
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Resolution R22-0569 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8004
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Change Order Nos. 1-4 To Contract No. Gf-2015-c-0035 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Title
Change Order Nos. 1-4 To Contract No. Gf-2015-c-0035 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Council | Resolution R22-0569 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8004 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0569 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-06-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-05-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |