DC PR22-0837 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-31 - Resolution R22-0554 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8971
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-31 - Resolution R22-0554 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8971
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Historic Preservation Review Board Gretchen Pfaehler Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Title
Historic Preservation Review Board Gretchen Pfaehler Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-31 | Council | Resolution R22-0554 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8971 |
2018-08-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-07-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0837 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0554 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-06-21 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-06-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-05-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0837 Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |