DC PR22-0819 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Resolution R22-0513 Effective from June 5, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 6468
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Resolution R22-0513 Effective from June 5, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 6468
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Georgetown Day School Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution Of 2018
Title
Georgetown Day School Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Council | Resolution R22-0513 Effective from June 5, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 6468 |
2018-06-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0513 |
2018-06-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-05-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-05-30 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0819 |
2018-04-30 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-04-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0819 Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2018-04-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |