DC PR22-0811 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Resolution R22-0472 Effective from April 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4308
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Resolution R22-0472 Effective from April 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4308
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Collective Bargaining Agreement Between The Not-for-profit Hospital Corporation - United Medical Center And The District Of Columbia Nurses Association Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Title
Collective Bargaining Agreement Between The Not-for-profit Hospital Corporation - United Medical Center And The District Of Columbia Nurses Association Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-20 | Council | Resolution R22-0472 Effective from April 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4308 |
2018-04-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0472 |
2018-04-10 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-04-10 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-03-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |