DC PR22-0809 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Resolution R22-0465 Effective from April 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4296
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Resolution R22-0465 Effective from April 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4296
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To approve multi-year contract CA 22-435.
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Union Station Funding Agreement Approval Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-20 | Council | Resolution R22-0465 Effective from April 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4296 |
2018-04-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0465 |
2018-04-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-03-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0809 Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-03-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |