DC PR22-0796 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sense Of The Council Virginia And Maryland Assault Rifle Prohibition Resolution Of 2018
Title
Sense Of The Council Virginia And Maryland Assault Rifle Prohibition Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-03-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0796 Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2018-03-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-0796 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39838/PR22-0796-Introduction.pdf |