DC PR22-0759 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Resolution R22-0460 Effective from June 1, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5997
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Resolution R22-0460 Effective from June 1, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5997
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District Of Columbia Corrections Information Council Governing Board Katharine Aiken Huffman Reappointment Resolution Of 2018
Title
District Of Columbia Corrections Information Council Governing Board Katharine Aiken Huffman Reappointment Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Council | Resolution R22-0460 Effective from June 1, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5997 |
2018-06-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0460 |
2018-05-17 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-04-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0759 |
2018-04-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-03-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0759 Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |