DC PR22-0757 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Resolution R22-0422 Effective from March 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2645
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Resolution R22-0422 Effective from March 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2645
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Personal Delivery Device Pilot Program Extension Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Of 2018
Title
Personal Delivery Device Pilot Program Extension Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Council | Resolution R22-0422 Effective from March 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2645 |
2018-03-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0422 |
2018-03-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-03-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-03-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |