DC PR22-0752 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-23 - Resolution R22-0414 Effective from February 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 1829
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-23 - Resolution R22-0414 Effective from February 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 1829
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications To Contract No. Cw20202 With Lucky Dog, Llc Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Title
Modifications To Contract No. Cw20202 With Lucky Dog, Llc Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Council | Resolution R22-0414 Effective from February 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 1829 |
2018-02-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0414 |
2018-02-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-02-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-01-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |