DC PR22-0739 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Resolution R22-0430 Effective from March 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3344
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Resolution R22-0430 Effective from March 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3344
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes To District Government Employee Pay Schedules Approval Resolution Of 2018
Title
Changes To District Government Employee Pay Schedules Approval Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Council | Resolution R22-0430 Effective from March 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3344 |
2018-03-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0430 |
2018-03-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-02-14 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-02-13 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0739 |
2018-02-09 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-02-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2018-02-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0739 Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |