DC PR22-0691 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-24 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sense Of The Council Opposing The Repeal Of Net Neutrality Rules Resolution Of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sense Of The Council Opposing The Repeal Of Net Neutrality Rules Resolution Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-24CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2018-01-12CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-12-22CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR22-0691 Published in the DC Register
2017-12-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations
2017-12-19CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback