DC PR22-0683 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Compensation Agreement Between The District Of Columbia And The Office Of The Attorney General And The American Federation Of Government Employees, Local 1403, Afl-cio (compensation Unit 33) Approval Resolution Of 2017
Title
Compensation Agreement Between The District Of Columbia And The Office Of The Attorney General And The American Federation Of Government Employees, Local 1403, Afl-cio (compensation Unit 33) Approval Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-12-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0683 Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2017-12-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-0683 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39445/PR22-0683-Introduction.pdf |