DC PR22-0678 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Resolution R22-0360 Effective from December 12, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12917
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Resolution R22-0360 Effective from December 12, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12917
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District Of Columbia Housing Finance Agency Multifamily Housing Pipeline Revenue Bond Obligation Financing Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2017
Title
District Of Columbia Housing Finance Agency Multifamily Housing Pipeline Revenue Bond Obligation Financing Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-22 | Council | Resolution R22-0360 Effective from December 12, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12917 |
2017-12-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-12-12 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0360 |
2017-12-12 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-12-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |