DC PR22-0654 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-05 - Resolution R22-0312 Effective from December 5, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Fiscal Year 2018 Budget Support Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fiscal Year 2018 Budget Support Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-05CouncilResolution R22-0312 Effective from December 5, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 29
2017-12-19CouncilRetained by the Council
2017-12-05CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R22-0312
2017-12-05CouncilFinal Reading CC
2017-12-04CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback