DC PR22-0644 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-31 - Resolution R22-0396 Effective from February 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8967
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-31 - Resolution R22-0396 Effective from February 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8967
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District Of Columbia Commemorative Works Committee Maryam F. Foye Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Title
District Of Columbia Commemorative Works Committee Maryam F. Foye Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-31 | Council | Resolution R22-0396 Effective from February 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8967 |
2018-08-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-02-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0644 |
2018-02-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0396 |
2018-02-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-01-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-01-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0644 Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-11-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |