DC PR22-0633 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Resolution R22-0350 Effective from December 5, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12608
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Resolution R22-0350 Effective from December 5, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12608
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sidwell Friends School Revenue Bonds Project Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2017
Title
Sidwell Friends School Revenue Bonds Project Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-15 | Council | Resolution R22-0350 Effective from December 5, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12608 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0350 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-12-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-11-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |