DC PR22-0630 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Resolution R22-0347 Effective from December 5, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12904
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Resolution R22-0347 Effective from December 5, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12904
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Center For Strategic And International Studies, Inc. Revenue Bonds Project Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Title
Center For Strategic And International Studies, Inc. Revenue Bonds Project Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-22 | Council | Resolution R22-0347 Effective from December 5, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12904 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0347 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-12-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-11-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |