DC PR22-0608 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-05 - Resolution R22-0297 Effective from November 14, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-05 - Resolution R22-0297 Effective from November 14, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Employee Relations Board Ann Hoffman Confirmation Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2017
Title
Public Employee Relations Board Ann Hoffman Confirmation Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-05 | Council | Resolution R22-0297 Effective from November 14, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 24 |
2017-11-14 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0297 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-11-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-11-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |