DC PR22-0606 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-05 - Resolution R22-0301 Effective from November 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-05 - Resolution R22-0301 Effective from November 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agreement Between The International Association Of Fire Fighters, Local 36 And The Fire And Emergency Medical Services Department Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2017
Title
Agreement Between The International Association Of Fire Fighters, Local 36 And The Fire And Emergency Medical Services Department Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-05 | Council | Resolution R22-0301 Effective from November 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 27 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0301 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-11-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-11-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |