DC PR22-0600 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-28 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-28 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deemed disapproved 2/14/2018
Title
Homeland Security Commission Joseph Green Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-28 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-11-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0600 Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-11-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-0600 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39147/PR22-0600-Introduction.pdf |