DC PR22-0594 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-17 - Resolution R22-0283 Effective from November 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 11869
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-17 - Resolution R22-0283 Effective from November 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 11869
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Obverse Corporation, Inc.
Title
Modifications To Contract No. Cw49828 With Obverse Corporation, Inc. Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-17 | Council | Resolution R22-0283 Effective from November 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 11869 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0283 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-11-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-10-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |